AK SJR11 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 10/21 LEGIS RESOLVE 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 10/21 LEGIS RESOLVE 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
U.s.-canada Railroad Presidential Permit
Title
U.s.-canada Railroad Presidential Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 10/21 LEGIS RESOLVE 7 |
2019-07-20 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2019-07-20 | Senate | 1:50 P.M. 7/19/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-14 | House | VERSION: CSSJR 11(TRA) |
2019-05-14 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED Y36 N1 A3 |
2019-05-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 11(TRA) |
2019-05-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-13 | House | HELD TO 5/14 CALENDAR |
2019-05-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2019 |
2019-04-26 | House | FN1: ZERO(S.TRA) |
2019-04-26 | House | DP: TALERICO, STORY, RASMUSSEN, CLAMAN, WOOL, STUTES |
2019-04-26 | House | TRA RPT 6DP |
2019-04-16 | House | TRA |
2019-04-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: CSSJR 11(TRA) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 11(TRA) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2019-04-15 | Senate | TRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-04-15 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND UC |
2019-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR |
2019-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.TRA) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | NR: WILSON |
2019-04-10 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, SHOWER, KIEHL |
2019-04-10 | Senate | TRA RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2019-04-05 | Senate | TRA |
2019-04-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska Natives
Boundaries
Corporations
Economic Development
Economy
Environmental Concerns
Highways
Intergovernmental Relations
International Relations
Investments
Land
Native Organizations
Permits
Planning
Public Land
Public Safety
Railroad
Regulations
Safety
Transportation
Boundaries
Corporations
Economic Development
Economy
Environmental Concerns
Highways
Intergovernmental Relations
International Relations
Investments
Land
Native Organizations
Permits
Planning
Public Land
Public Safety
Railroad
Regulations
Safety
Transportation