AK SJR9 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Const.am: Approp. Bill For Publ Education
Title
Const.am: Approp. Bill For Publ Education
Sponsors
Sen. Mia Costello [R] | Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] | Sen. Lyman Hoffman [D] | Sen. Donald Olson [D] |
Sen. Gary Stevens [R] | Sen. Tom Begich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(EED/FUNDCAP) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, KIEHL |
2019-04-29 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(EED/FUNDCAP) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO |
2019-04-01 | Senate | NR: STEVENS, BIRCH, HUGHES |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EDC RPT 3NR 1DP |
2019-03-25 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, OLSON, STEVENS |
2019-03-25 | Senate | COSPONSOR WITHDRAWN: BEGICH |
2019-03-15 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON |
2019-03-13 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH |
2019-03-06 | Senate | EDC, JUD, FIN |
2019-03-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=SJR9 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SJR009A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SJR009B.PDF |