AL HB100 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure, Asbestos Trust Claims Transparency Act, disclosure of all viable asbestos trust claims required, Secs. 6-5-690 to 6-5-696 added.
Title
Civil procedure, Asbestos Trust Claims Transparency Act, disclosure of all viable asbestos trust claims required, Secs. 6-5-690 to 6-5-696 added.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Carns [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 384 |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 383 |
2019-04-25 | House | Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |