AL HB110 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Forwarded to Governor on April 18, 2019 at 11:34 a.m. on April 18, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Forwarded to Governor on April 18, 2019 at 11:34 a.m. on April 18, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Contractors, State Licensing Board for, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2020.
Title
General Contractors, State Licensing Board for, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 18, 2019 at 11:34 a.m. on April 18, 2019. |
2019-04-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-72. |
2019-04-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 241 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 29 |
2019-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |