AL HB116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on april 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Landscape Architects, Alabama Board of Examiners of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landscape Architects, Alabama Board of Examiners of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on april 16, 2019.
2019-04-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-56.
2019-04-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-04-16SenateSignature Requested
2019-04-11HouseEnrolled
2019-04-11HousePassed Second House
2019-04-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 216
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2019-03-21HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41
2019-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback