AL HB124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee on HB124 2019RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee on HB124 2019RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Historical Commission, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2023.
Title
Historical Commission, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Sanderford motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Sanderford motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Sanderford motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Sanderford motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee on HB124 2019RS first Substitute Offered |
2019-04-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on April 25, 2019. |
2019-04-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-93. |
2019-04-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-23 | House | Concurred in Conference Report |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 386 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2019-04-23 | House | Sanderford motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 306 |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Report |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 348 P&PO appoints Chambliss, Figures and Reed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Requested |
2019-04-18 | House | Sanderford motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 228 House appoints Sanderford, Reynolds and Hall |
2019-04-18 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 246 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 245 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | McClendon Amendment Offered |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 57 |
2019-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |