AL HB128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans, distinctive license plates, Air Medal added to military awards eligible to be commemorated, Secs. 32-6-250, 32-6-251 am'd.
Title
Veterans, distinctive license plates, Air Medal added to military awards eligible to be commemorated, Secs. 32-6-250, 32-6-251 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Education Policy |
2019-05-29 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs first Amendment Offered |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2019-05-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 971 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 970 |
2019-05-23 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs 1st Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 969 |
2019-05-23 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs 2nd Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |