AL HB139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance proceeds on residential real property, withheld by lender, release and notice requirement provided
Title
Insurance proceeds on residential real property, withheld by lender, release and notice requirement provided
Sponsors
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-460. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1329 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 399 |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 398 |
2019-04-25 | House | Insurance Amendment Offered |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |