AL HB152 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-394.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

General Fund budget, appropriations for other functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for fiscal year ending September 30, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Fund budget, appropriations for other functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for fiscal year ending September 30, 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Albritton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Albritton to Suspend Joint Rule 21 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Clouse motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-394.
2019-05-31HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
2019-05-31HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-31SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-30HouseEnrolled
2019-05-30HouseConcurred in Conference Report
2019-05-30SenateAlbritton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1388
2019-05-30SenateAlbritton to Suspend Joint Rule 21 adopted Roll Call 1387
2019-05-30SenateConference Report Concurrence Requested
2019-05-30HouseClouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1174
2019-05-30HouseConference Committee on HB152 2019RS first Substitute Offered
2019-05-30HouseConference Report
2019-05-30HouseClouse motion to Suspend Rules adopted Roll Call 1173
2019-05-28HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-05-28SenateMarsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1174 P&PO appoints Marsh, Albritton and Singleton
2019-05-28SenateConference Committee Requested
2019-05-21HouseClouse motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 846 House appoints Hall, South and Clouse
2019-05-21HouseConcurrence Requested
2019-05-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 969
2019-05-21SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 968
2019-05-21SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2019-05-21SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 967
2019-05-21SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2019-05-21SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 966
2019-05-21SenateAlbritton Amendment Offered
2019-05-21SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 965
2019-05-21SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-04-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2019-04-09HouseEngrossed
2019-04-09HouseMooney intended to vote "Yea"
2019-04-09HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 166
2019-04-09HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 165
2019-04-09HouseClouse Amendment Offered
2019-04-09HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 164
2019-04-09HouseWays and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB152&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB152-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB152-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB152-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198428-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198869-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201158-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201434-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201586-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201676-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202015-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=609162&VOTE=164&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=609179&VOTE=165&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=609181&VOTE=166&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621271&VOTE=965&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621292&VOTE=966&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621294&VOTE=967&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621296&VOTE=968&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621297&VOTE=969&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621478&VOTE=846&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=624332&VOTE=1174&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626334&VOTE=1174&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626827&VOTE=1387&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626838&VOTE=1388&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback