AL HB156 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
2019-05-22HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-275.
2019-05-22HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-22SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-21HouseEnrolled
2019-05-21HousePassed Second House
2019-05-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 973
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2019-04-09HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 159
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback