AL HB158 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Houston Co., judge of probate, required to be an attorney licensed in this state, const. amend.
Title
Houston Co., judge of probate, required to be an attorney licensed in this state, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019. |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-190. |
2019-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 739 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-02 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 62 |
2019-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 61 |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |