AL HB16 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal elections, voters required to register in same time frame as registering for county or state elections, Sec. 11-46-38 am'd.
Title
Municipal elections, voters required to register in same time frame as registering for county or state elections, Sec. 11-46-38 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-358. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1206 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-04-03 | House | Grimsley intended to vote "Nay" |
2019-04-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 90 |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Hill motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |