AL HB163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor on May 7, 2019 at 3:54 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor on May 7, 2019 at 3:54 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor fuel taxes, Revenue Commissioner authorized to temporarily waive licensing requirements for fuel importers, exporters, and transporters during a state of emergency, Sec. 40-2-11 am'd.
Title
Motor fuel taxes, Revenue Commissioner authorized to temporarily waive licensing requirements for fuel importers, exporters, and transporters during a state of emergency, Sec. 40-2-11 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 7, 2019 at 3:54 p.m. on May 7, 2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-164. |
2019-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-07 | House | McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 537 |
2019-05-07 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 451 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 450 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 227 |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |