AL HB168 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Delivered to Governor at 5:10 p.m. on April 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, wet counties and wet municipalities, authorized to permit and regulate by ordinance or subject to referendum, Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, wet counties and wet municipalities, authorized to permit and regulate by ordinance or subject to referendum, Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:10 p.m. on April 30, 2019.
2019-04-30HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-100.
2019-04-30HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-04-30SenateSignature Requested
2019-04-30HouseEnrolled
2019-04-30HousePassed Second House
2019-04-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 421
2019-04-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism
2019-04-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 105
2019-04-04HouseEngrossed
2019-04-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 104
2019-04-04HouseClouse Amendment Offered
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB168&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB168-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB168-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198751-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=608386&VOTE=104&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=608418&VOTE=105&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613839&VOTE=421&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback