AL HB176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitals, private hospital assessment and Medicaid funding program extended through 2022, Secs. 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-77.1, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-81, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.
Title
Hospitals, private hospital assessment and Medicaid funding program extended through 2022, Secs. 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-77.1, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-81, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019. |
2019-05-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-278. |
2019-05-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 977 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2019-04-09 | House | Wood intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 161 |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |