AL HB180 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure, crime victims' compensation, Lisa's Law, entity contract, with convicted felons, escrow account for benefit of crime victims created, procedure, Sec. 41-9-80.1 to 41-9-80.8, inclusive, added; 41-9-80 to 41-9-84, inclusive, repealed.
Title
Criminal procedure, crime victims' compensation, Lisa's Law, entity contract, with convicted felons, escrow account for benefit of crime victims created, procedure, Sec. 41-9-80.1 to 41-9-80.8, inclusive, added; 41-9-80 to 41-9-84, inclusive, repealed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - House - Robertson motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Robertson motion to Table (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Robertson motion to Table (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Robertson motion to Table (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Robertson motion to Table (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Judiciary second amendment offered |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-538. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-31 | House | Robertson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1284 |
2019-05-31 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1476 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1475 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1468 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Ward first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 193 |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 192 |
2019-04-16 | House | Robertson first Substitute Offered |
2019-04-16 | House | Robertson motion to Table adopted Roll Call 191 |
2019-04-16 | House | Judiciary Amendment #2 Offered |
2019-04-16 | House | Robertson motion to Table adopted Roll Call 190 |
2019-04-16 | House | Judiciary Amendment #1 Offered |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |