AL HB195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile Co., Co. Commission District 1, volunteer fire departments, board established to evaluate services, co. commission authorized to levy service fee, distribution of proceeds for fire protection, implementation date extended, municipalities not to diminish funding, audits, fee designated fire protection and suppression fee, Act 2015-258, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd and reenacted
Title
Mobile Co., Co. Commission District 1, volunteer fire departments, board established to evaluate services, co. commission authorized to levy service fee, distribution of proceeds for fire protection, implementation date extended, municipalities not to diminish funding, audits, fee designated fire protection and suppression fee, Act 2015-258, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd and reenacted
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-152 on 05/13/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 525 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Mobile County Legislation |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 266 |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |