AL HB212 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, right side driving required on interstate highways under certain conditions, exceptions, subject to criminal penalties, Anti-Road Rage Act, Sec. 32-5A-80 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, right side driving required on interstate highways under certain conditions, exceptions, subject to criminal penalties, Anti-Road Rage Act, Sec. 32-5A-80 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 61 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 61 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-515. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1202 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
2019-04-11 | House | Mooney and Wingo intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-04-11 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 173 |
2019-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 172 |
2019-04-11 | House | McMillan Amendment Offered |
2019-04-11 | House | Whorton motion to withdraw adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-11 | House | Whorton Amendment Offered |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |