AL HB232 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:23 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:23 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Clair Co., ad valorem tax, special school district taxes, procedures for levy, use for public school purposes in district where levied, const. amend.
Title
St. Clair Co., ad valorem tax, special school district taxes, procedures for levy, use for public school purposes in district where levied, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:23 p.m. on April 23, 2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-64. |
2019-04-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 297 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 100 |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 99 |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |