AL HB235 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fayette Co., ad valorem tax, add'l 3 mills, paid to Fayette Co. Firefighters Association, distrib to the paid and volunteer fire depts, const. amend.
Title
Fayette Co., ad valorem tax, add'l 3 mills, paid to Fayette Co. Firefighters Association, distrib to the paid and volunteer fire depts, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-18 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 255 |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 254 |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 253 |
2019-04-18 | House | Local Legislation Amendment Offered |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |