AL HB248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clay Co. Community Corrections Program, director and employees, power of arrest under certain conditions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clay Co. Community Corrections Program, director and employees, power of arrest under certain conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 17) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
2019-05-07HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-159.
2019-05-07HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-07SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled
2019-05-02HousePassed Second House
2019-05-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 491
2019-05-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-30SenateChambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-30SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-04-25SenateLivingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-25SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-04-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-04HouseJohnson and Hurst intended to vote "yea"
2019-04-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2019-04-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 95
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback