AL HB250 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Delivered to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on April 25, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Delivered to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on April 25, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Business organizations, Alabama Business Corporation Law revised, based on the Model Business Corporation Act of 2016 and Delaware General Corporation Law, Secs. 10A-2A-1.01 to 10A-2A-17.06, inclusive added; Secs. 10A-1-1.02, 10A-1-1.03, 10A-1-1.08, 10A-1-1.12, 10A-1-3.05, 10A-1-3.06, 10A-1-3.32, 10A-1-3.42, 10A-1-4.01, 10A-1-4.02, 10A-1-4.04, 10A-1-4.06, 10A-1-4.11, 10A-1-4.13, 10A-1-4.15, 10A-1-4.21, 10A-1-4.23, 10A-1-4.24, 10A-1-4.25, 10A-1-4.26, 10A-1-4.31, 10A-1-5.01, 10A-1-5.08, 10A-1-6.01, 10A-1-6.02, 10A-1-7.01, 10A-1-7.04, 10A-1-7.11, 10A-1-7.21, 10A-1-7.31, 10A-1-8.01, 10A-1-8.02, 10A-1-8.04, 10A-1-9.01, 10A-4-2.02, 10A-4-4.01, 10A-4-4.02, 10A-4-5.01, 10A-4-5.04, 10A-5A-10.01, 10A-5A-10.03, 10A-5A-10.04, 10A-5A-10.05, 10A-5A-10.07, 10A-5A-10.08, 10A-8A-9.02, 10A-8A-9.04, 10A-8A-9.05, 10A-8A-9.06, 10A-8A-9.08, 10A-8A-9.09, 10A-9A-10.02, 10A-9A-10.04, 10A-9A-10.05, 10A-9A-10.06, 10A-9A-10.08, 10A-9A-10.09, 10A-10-1.09, 10A-10-1.12, 10A-10-1.15, 10A-10-1.16, 10A-11-1.01, 10A-11-1.03, 10A-11-1.04, 10A-11-1.06, 10A-11-1.12, 10A-30-2.01, 10A-30-2.03, 10A-30-2.04, 10A-30-2.05, 10A-30-2.06, 10A-30-2.09, 10A-30-2.12, 10A-30-2.13, am'd; Secs. 10A-2-1.01 to 10A-2-17.02, inclusive, repealed
Title
Business organizations, Alabama Business Corporation Law revised, based on the Model Business Corporation Act of 2016 and Delaware General Corporation Law, Secs. 10A-2A-1.01 to 10A-2A-17.06, inclusive added; Secs. 10A-1-1.02, 10A-1-1.03, 10A-1-1.08, 10A-1-1.12, 10A-1-3.05, 10A-1-3.06, 10A-1-3.32, 10A-1-3.42, 10A-1-4.01, 10A-1-4.02, 10A-1-4.04, 10A-1-4.06, 10A-1-4.11, 10A-1-4.13, 10A-1-4.15, 10A-1-4.21, 10A-1-4.23, 10A-1-4.24, 10A-1-4.25, 10A-1-4.26, 10A-1-4.31, 10A-1-5.01, 10A-1-5.08, 10A-1-6.01, 10A-1-6.02, 10A-1-7.01, 10A-1-7.04, 10A-1-7.11, 10A-1-7.21, 10A-1-7.31, 10A-1-8.01, 10A-1-8.02, 10A-1-8.04, 10A-1-9.01, 10A-4-2.02, 10A-4-4.01, 10A-4-4.02, 10A-4-5.01, 10A-4-5.04, 10A-5A-10.01, 10A-5A-10.03, 10A-5A-10.04, 10A-5A-10.05, 10A-5A-10.07, 10A-5A-10.08, 10A-8A-9.02, 10A-8A-9.04, 10A-8A-9.05, 10A-8A-9.06, 10A-8A-9.08, 10A-8A-9.09, 10A-9A-10.02, 10A-9A-10.04, 10A-9A-10.05, 10A-9A-10.06, 10A-9A-10.08, 10A-9A-10.09, 10A-10-1.09, 10A-10-1.12, 10A-10-1.15, 10A-10-1.16, 10A-11-1.01, 10A-11-1.03, 10A-11-1.04, 10A-11-1.06, 10A-11-1.12, 10A-30-2.01, 10A-30-2.03, 10A-30-2.04, 10A-30-2.05, 10A-30-2.06, 10A-30-2.09, 10A-30-2.12, 10A-30-2.13, am'd; Secs. 10A-2-1.01 to 10A-2-17.02, inclusive, repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on April 25, 2019. |
2019-04-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-94. |
2019-04-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 359 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 124 |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |