AL HB251 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019l.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019l.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limited Liability Company Law, name revised, duty of partner not to compete before dissolution of partnership, clarified, retroactive effect, Secs. 10A-5A-1.01, 10A-8A-1.02, 10A-8A-4.11 am'd.
Title
Limited Liability Company Law, name revised, duty of partner not to compete before dissolution of partnership, clarified, retroactive effect, Secs. 10A-5A-1.01, 10A-8A-1.02, 10A-8A-4.11 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - England motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019l. |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-304. |
2019-05-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-22 | House | England motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 883 |
2019-05-22 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 361 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 126 |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |