AL HB255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Toll Roads and Bridges, notice to pay a toll, further provided, failure to pay toll citation, further provided, non-renewal of vehicle registration, provided, authority to enter in reciprocal agreements, further provided, Secs. 23-2-167, 23-2-168, 23-2-169, 23-2-172, 23-2-173, 23-2-175 am'd.
Title
Toll Roads and Bridges, notice to pay a toll, further provided, failure to pay toll citation, further provided, non-renewal of vehicle registration, provided, authority to enter in reciprocal agreements, further provided, Secs. 23-2-167, 23-2-168, 23-2-169, 23-2-172, 23-2-173, 23-2-175 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 998 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 997 |
2019-05-23 | House | McMillan Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 996 |
2019-05-23 | House | Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |