AL HB287 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Assigned Act No. 2019-178.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Historical Commission, plan for monuments for Rosa Parks and Helen Keller on State Capitol grounds, use of public and private funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historical Commission, plan for monuments for Rosa Parks and Helen Keller on State Capitol grounds, use of public and private funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-178.
2019-05-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019.
2019-05-08HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-08SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled
2019-05-07HousePassed Second House
2019-05-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 613
2019-05-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed
2019-04-23HouseCosponsors Added
2019-04-23HouseGrimley intended to vote "Yea"
2019-04-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 348
2019-04-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 347
2019-04-23HouseHall first Substitute Offered
2019-04-23HouseMotion to Table adopted Roll Call 346
2019-04-23HouseState Government first Substitute Offered
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-03-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB287&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB287-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB287-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198784-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199375-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612566&VOTE=346&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612568&VOTE=347&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612569&VOTE=348&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=616494&VOTE=613&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback