AL HB299 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Delivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Delivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., rental tax, co. commission authorized to levy and collect, exemptions, administration and enforcement of rental tax
Title
Montgomery Co., rental tax, co. commission authorized to levy and collect, exemptions, administration and enforcement of rental tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on April 23, 2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-91. |
2019-04-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 295 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 146 |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |