AL HB32 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School campus, Kyle Graddy Act, self-administration of single dose autoinjectable epinephrine on K-12 school campuses by students, Secs. 16-1-39, 16-1-48 am'd
Title
School campus, Kyle Graddy Act, self-administration of single dose autoinjectable epinephrine on K-12 school campuses by students, Secs. 16-1-39, 16-1-48 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-456. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1469 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2019-05-14 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 685 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 684 |
2019-05-14 | House | Boyd Amendment Offered |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Rereferred from EP to Health |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |