AL HB349 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Age of majority, jurisdiction of juvenile court, admission to public school, involuntary commitments of persons who are mentally ill, right to contract, child protective services of Dept. of Human Resources, further provided, Secs. 12-15-102, 16-28-3, 22-52-16, 26-1-1, 26-14-1 am'd.
Title
Age of majority, jurisdiction of juvenile court, admission to public school, involuntary commitments of persons who are mentally ill, right to contract, child protective services of Dept. of Human Resources, further provided, Secs. 12-15-102, 16-28-3, 22-52-16, 26-1-1, 26-14-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-447. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-30 | House | Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1172 |
2019-05-30 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1332 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1331 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Melson Amendment Offered |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2019-05-02 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 495 |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 494 |
2019-05-02 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |