AL HB361 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Concurrence Requested
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Concurrence Requested
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fantasy contests, regulation of, consumer protection measures by operators required, regulation, registration of operators with the Atty. Gen's Office, fees, taxation, audits, penalties, Fantasy Contests Act
Title
Fantasy contests, regulation of, consumer protection measures by operators required, regulation, registration of operators with the Atty. Gen's Office, fees, taxation, audits, penalties, Fantasy Contests Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Blackshear motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Hanes motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 21 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 55 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Hanes motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 21 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 55 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - South motion to Table (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-343. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Blackshear motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1097 |
2019-05-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1173 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Roberts motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1172 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Roberts Amendment Offered |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1171 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1170 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Sessions motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Singleton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-08 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Roberts Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 584 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Hanes motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 583 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |
2019-05-08 | House | South motion to Table adopted Roll Call 582 |
2019-05-08 | House | Carns Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | House | Hollis intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-05-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 581 |
2019-05-08 | House | Howard Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | House | South motion to Table adopted Roll Call 580 |
2019-05-08 | House | Mooney Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | House | South motion to Table adopted Roll Call 579 |
2019-05-08 | House | Jones (M) Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | House | South motion to Table adopted Roll Call 578 |
2019-05-08 | House | Dismukes Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | House | South motion to Table adopted Roll Call 577 |
2019-05-08 | House | Standridge Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | House | South motion to Table adopted Roll Call 576 |
2019-05-08 | House | Holmes Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 575 |
2019-05-08 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Acted on by State Government as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2019-04-04 | House | Rereferred from ED&T to SG |
2019-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |