AL HB368 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oxford, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales by retail licensees for off-premises consumption, city council authorized to regulate and permit, referendum
Title
Oxford, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales by retail licensees for off-premises consumption, city council authorized to regulate and permit, referendum
Sponsors
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 82 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 82 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 15, 2019. |
2019-05-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-209. |
2019-05-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 725 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362 |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |