AL HB380 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Forwarded to Governor on May 30, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Forwarded to Governor on May 30, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pardons and Paroles Board, Governor, appointment of bd. members, nominations, appointment of Director of Pardons and Paroles, responsibilities, criteria for board to determine consideration for parole, procedures for deviations, AG to reveiw, Secs. 15-22-20, 15-22-21, 15-22-26, 15-22-28, 15-22-36, 15-22-37 am'd.
Title
Pardons and Paroles Board, Governor, appointment of bd. members, nominations, appointment of Director of Pardons and Paroles, responsibilities, criteria for board to determine consideration for parole, procedures for deviations, AG to reveiw, Secs. 15-22-20, 15-22-21, 15-22-26, 15-22-28, 15-22-36, 15-22-37 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Alexander motion to Carry Over to Day Certain (Y: 26 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Jackson motion to Adjourn (Y: 19 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Alexander motion to Carry Over to Day Certain (Y: 26 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Jackson motion to Adjourn (Y: 19 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 30, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-393. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1370 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 1368 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1369 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary as Favorable |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-09 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 618 |
2019-05-09 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 617 |
2019-05-09 | House | Alexander motion to Carry Over to Day Certain lost Roll Call 616 |
2019-05-09 | House | Rowe motion to Table adopted Roll Call 615 |
2019-05-09 | House | Bracy Amendment Offered |
2019-05-09 | House | Rowe motion to Table adopted Roll Call 614 |
2019-05-09 | House | Alexander Amendment Offered |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 613 |
2019-05-09 | House | Jackson motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 612 |
2019-05-09 | House | Howard Amendment Offered |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 611 |
2019-05-09 | House | Rowe Amendment Offered |
2019-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |