AL HB383 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, sales and use taxes and lodging taxes, qualifying seasonal taxpayers may have different filing periods, Secs. 40-23-7, 40-23-68, 40-26-3 am'd.
Title
Taxation, sales and use taxes and lodging taxes, qualifying seasonal taxpayers may have different filing periods, Secs. 40-23-7, 40-23-68, 40-26-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on May 16, 2019. |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-253. |
2019-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 894 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2019-04-30 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 438 |
2019-04-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 437 |
2019-04-30 | House | Baker Amendment Offered |
2019-04-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |