AL HB384 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., retirement system, definitions, pension board, qualification, elections of members, duties, Secs. 45-37-123.01, 45-37-123.21, 45-37-123.22, 45-37-123.24, 45-37-123.53, 45-37-123.54, 45-37-123.82, 45-37-123.101, 45-37-123.103, 45-37-123.104, 45-37-123.151, 45-37-123.195 am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., retirement system, definitions, pension board, qualification, elections of members, duties, Secs. 45-37-123.01, 45-37-123.21, 45-37-123.22, 45-37-123.24, 45-37-123.53, 45-37-123.54, 45-37-123.82, 45-37-123.101, 45-37-123.103, 45-37-123.104, 45-37-123.151, 45-37-123.195 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Carns [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019. |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-243. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 730 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2019-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 405 |
2019-04-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |