AL HB390 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:43 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:43 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., sheriff, qualifications, continuing education required
Title
Montgomery Co., sheriff, qualifications, continuing education required
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Ingram [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:43 p.m. on May 9, 2020. |
2020-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-146. |
2020-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 706 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-07 | House | Ledbetter intended to vote "Abstain" |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 485 |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |