AL HB428 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances, children, exposure to by mother, immunity from criminal liability upon good faith belief that use was pursuant to lawful prescription; reporting of chemical endangerment not required under certain conditions, Sec. 26-15-3.3 added
Title
Controlled substances, children, exposure to by mother, immunity from criminal liability upon good faith belief that use was pursuant to lawful prescription; reporting of chemical endangerment not required under certain conditions, Sec. 26-15-3.3 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-17 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |