AL HB428 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Read for the second time and referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government per Rule 50(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Read for the second time and referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government per Rule 50(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tuscaloosa Co, privately owned sewer systems that use public rights-of-way of public roads, req'd to be certified and regulated by PSC, const. amend.
Title
Tuscaloosa Co, privately owned sewer systems that use public rights-of-way of public roads, req'd to be certified and regulated by PSC, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Wingo [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Local Application Roll Call 834 (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 30 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government per Rule 50(b) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Local Application Roll Call 834 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 833 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 832 |
2018-03-15 | House | Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-03-08 | House | Rereferred from Calendar to TU&I |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation |