AL HB456 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parks, recreational vehicle parks, procedure for removing guests under certain conditions, criminal penalties for failure to leave
Title
Parks, recreational vehicle parks, procedure for removing guests under certain conditions, criminal penalties for failure to leave
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-463. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1470 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-02 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 505 |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 504 |
2019-05-02 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |