AL HB46 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, retail licensees, making of infusions using distilled spirits authorized, Sec. 28-3A-20.3 added; Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, retail licensees, making of infusions using distilled spirits authorized, Sec. 28-3A-20.3 added; Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-492. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1223 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 78 |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |