AL HB465 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Talladega Co., churches, deadly physical force, use in self-defense or defense of others
Title
Talladega Co., churches, deadly physical force, use in self-defense or defense of others
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-09 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 602 |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601 |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 600 |
2019-05-09 | House | Local Legislation Amendment Offered |
2019-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |