AL HB468 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 12:41 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 12:41 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Dept., two-step salary increase for certain employees, payment for any accrued and unused annual leave authorized, bonuses under certain conditions, Secs. 14-1-20, 36-26-35 am'd.
Title
Corrections Dept., two-step salary increase for certain employees, payment for any accrued and unused annual leave authorized, bonuses under certain conditions, Secs. 14-1-20, 36-26-35 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 12:41 p.m. on May 23, 2019. |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-286. |
2019-05-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1119 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2019-04-30 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 430 |
2019-04-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |