AL HB471 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Houston Co., probate judge shall collect a tag transaction fee, distrib. for emergency medical services, referendum
Title
Houston Co., probate judge shall collect a tag transaction fee, distrib. for emergency medical services, referendum
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020. |
2020-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-191. |
2020-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 681 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 530 |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |