AL HB483 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:55 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:55 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Title
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:55 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-363. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1292 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 517 |
2019-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported from Baldwin County Legislation as Favorable |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |