AL HB485 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cullman Co., the Battleground School Historical Board estab., immunity for board members, property may be transferred to county board of education
Title
Cullman Co., the Battleground School Historical Board estab., immunity for board members, property may be transferred to county board of education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020. |
2020-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-160. |
2020-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 689 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-07 | House | Engrossed |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 494 |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 493 |
2020-05-07 | House | Local Legislation Amendment Offered |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |