AL HB492 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Co., co. commission, county roads and bridges, construction and maintenance under two co. depts., one dept. for unpaved roads, one dept. for paved roads and bridges, Act 2011-605, 2011 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Washington Co., co. commission, county roads and bridges, construction and maintenance under two co. depts., one dept. for unpaved roads, one dept. for paved roads and bridges, Act 2011-605, 2011 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020. |
2020-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-164. |
2020-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 677 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 506 |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |