AL HB493 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lexington, alcoholic beverages, sale of draft beer authorized, establishments selling required to provide equipment necessary to dispense, referendum
Title
Lexington, alcoholic beverages, sale of draft beer authorized, establishments selling required to provide equipment necessary to dispense, referendum
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 78 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 78 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019. |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-250. |
2019-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 747 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 417 |
2019-04-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |