AL HB494 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Governor at 2:58 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Governor at 2:58 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Co., establish service of process fee for sheriff, Washington County Sheriff's Law Enforcement Fund established
Title
Washington Co., establish service of process fee for sheriff, Washington County Sheriff's Law Enforcement Fund established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:58 p.m. on May 18, 2020. |
2020-05-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-203. |
2020-05-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 731 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 508 |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |