AL HB5 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, check-off contribution to State Park Division of the Dept. of Conservation and Natural Resources, Dept. of Mental Health or the Alabama Medicaid Agency, Sec. 40-18-140 am'd.
Title
Taxation, check-off contribution to State Park Division of the Dept. of Conservation and Natural Resources, Dept. of Mental Health or the Alabama Medicaid Agency, Sec. 40-18-140 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. James Hanes [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 402 |
2018-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |