AL HB500 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., ad valorem tax for Montg. School Tax District, levy at rate $1.85 on each $100 (18.5 mills) by co. commission, referendum of Montg. Co., not to include Pike Road
Title
Montgomery Co., ad valorem tax for Montg. School Tax District, levy at rate $1.85 on each $100 (18.5 mills) by co. commission, referendum of Montg. Co., not to include Pike Road
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - House - Hatcher motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 55 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 55 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Hatcher motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 55 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Hatcher motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020. |
2020-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-197. |
2020-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2020-05-09 | House | Hatcher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 576 |
2020-05-09 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 709 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 708 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Barfoot Amendment Offered |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-07 | House | Engrossed |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 517 |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 516 |
2020-05-07 | House | Hatcher 2nd Amendment Offered |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 515 |
2020-05-07 | House | Hatcher 1st Amendment Offered |
2020-05-07 | House | Hatcher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 514 |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 513 |
2020-05-07 | House | MGMCL 2nd Amendment Offered |
2020-05-07 | House | MGMCL 1st Amendment Offered |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2020-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |