AL HB505 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Judges, vacancies, initial term of judges appt. to fill, further provided for, Amendment 328, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, am'd, const. amend.
Title
Judges, vacancies, initial term of judges appt. to fill, further provided for, Amendment 328, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, am'd, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Faulkner motion to Table (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Faulkner motion to Table (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered |
2019-05-31 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:25 p.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-346. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1455 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1031 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1030 |
2019-05-23 | House | Faulkner Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Faulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1029 |
2019-05-23 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |