AL HB507 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Etowah Co., board of registrars, working days increased, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Title
Etowah Co., board of registrars, working days increased, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 77 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 937 |
2018-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |